SD HB1032 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2016 H.J. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2016 H.J. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding guaranteed energy savings contracts.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding guaranteed energy savings contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2016 H.J. 332 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 08, 2016 H.J. 330 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 234 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 272 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 179 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 159 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 118 |
2016-01-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 140 |
2016-01-20 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 66 |
2016-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 36 |
2016-01-12 | House | First Reading House H.J. 21 |