SD HB1032 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-18 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 35. H.J. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-18 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 35. H.J. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to child support.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to child support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-01-13 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 35. H.J. 75 |
2017-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 72 |
2017-01-13 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 49 |
2017-01-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 23 |