SD HB1037 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - Signed by the Governor on February 12, 2016 H.J. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - Signed by the Governor on February 12, 2016 H.J. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning petitions for initiated constitutional amendments, initiated measures, and candidates.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning petitions for initiated constitutional amendments, initiated measures, and candidates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 12, 2016 H.J. 390 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 11, 2016 H.J. 386 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 288 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 351 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 248 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 228 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 130 |
2016-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 0. H.J. 155 |
2016-01-21 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-01-21 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 141 |
2016-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 36 |
2016-01-12 | House | First Reading House H.J. 22 |