SD HB1040 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2014.
Title
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2014.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 780 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 673 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 773 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 747 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 626 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 581 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040hd |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040hl |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040mi |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040hg |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040hk |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040hf |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040hh |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 481 |
2014-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 538 |
2014-02-21 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 483 |
2014-02-21 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040aa |
2014-02-21 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040md |
2014-02-21 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040nb |
2014-02-21 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040nc |
2014-02-21 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1040ha |
2014-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 23 |