SD HB1042 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 831
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 831
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase certain billboard permit fees.
Title
Increase certain billboard permit fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor H.J. 831 | |
2010-03-09 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 795 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 603 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 674 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 499 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 499 Amendment 1042OB | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 481 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 465 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 449 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 414 | |
2010-02-19 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 384 | |
2010-02-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 321 | |
2010-02-11 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 371 | |
2010-02-11 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 370 Amendment 1042fa | |
2010-02-10 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 359 | |
2010-02-09 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 323 | |
2010-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 26 |