SD HB1043 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by Governor H.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by Governor H.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions regarding the full-time equivalent staffing report.
Title
Repeal certain provisions regarding the full-time equivalent staffing report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Signed by Governor H.J. 542 | |
2012-02-21 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 538 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by President S.J. 473 | |
2012-02-15 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 497 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 408 | |
2012-02-13 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-13 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 379 | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-31 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 230 | |
2012-01-30 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 245 | |
2012-01-26 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 212 | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 23 |