SD HB1043 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 12. S.J. 294
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 12. S.J. 294
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Include lithium in the definition of precious metal for purposes of the minerals severance tax, and to set the tax rate for lithium severed in this state.
Title
Include lithium in the definition of precious metal for purposes of the minerals severance tax, and to set the tax rate for lithium severed in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Reconsidered (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Reconsidered (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 12. S.J. 294 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 294 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 289 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 23, NAYS 9. S.J. 289 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 256 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 236 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 3 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 3 Amendment 1043B |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 148 |
2024-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 9. H.J. 147 |
2024-01-18 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-18 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1043A |
2024-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 16 |