SD HB1047 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise various trust and trust company provisions.
Title
Revise various trust and trust company provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 388 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 384 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 276 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 342 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 244 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 221 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 172 |
2014-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 166 |
2014-01-24 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 94 |
2014-01-24 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1047oa |
2014-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 24 |