SD HB1055 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. H.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. H.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the special education property tax levy for school districts and to revise the state aid to special education formula.
Title
Revise the special education property tax levy for school districts and to revise the state aid to special education formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. H.J. 747 |
2018-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-03-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 27 |