SD HB1055 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize certain children who are subject to a military relocation to be eligible for registration with a state-approved distance learning provider.
Title
Authorize certain children who are subject to a military relocation to be eligible for registration with a state-approved distance learning provider.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-02 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2021 H.J. 455 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 369 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 431 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 341 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 278 |
2021-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 294 |
2021-02-10 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-10 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1055C |
2021-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Education, Passed H.J. 209 |
2021-02-01 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 3 |
2021-02-01 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 2 Amendment 1055B |
2021-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 34 |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 28 |