SD HB1074 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow copies of juvenile files to be provided to certain named parties or by court order rather than limiting use to inspection of the file only.
Title
Allow copies of juvenile files to be provided to certain named parties or by court order rather than limiting use to inspection of the file only.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Signed by Governor H.J. 716 | |
2010-03-02 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 663 | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 500 | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 619 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 464 | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 428 | |
2010-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 230 | |
2010-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 270 | |
2010-02-01 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-01 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 237 | |
2010-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-19 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 109 |