SD HB1082 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permit counties to require criminal background checks for persons seeking employment.
Title
Permit counties to require criminal background checks for persons seeking employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] | Sen. Jason Gant [R] | Sen. Kathleen Miles [D] |
Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Signed by Governor H.J. 622 | |
2010-02-25 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 618 | |
2010-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 469 | |
2010-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 591 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 410 | |
2010-02-19 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 384 | |
2010-02-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 278 | |
2010-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 336 | |
2010-02-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 317 | |
2010-02-02 | Local Government Title amended, Passed Amendment 1082fta | |
2010-02-02 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 255 | |
2010-02-02 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1082fa | |
2010-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-19 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 111 |