SD HB1082 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Codify the list of navigable streams requiring gates.
Title
Codify the list of navigable streams requiring gates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 23, 2016 H.J. 650 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 398 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 455 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 327 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 302 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 218 |
2016-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 269 |
2016-02-02 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 230 |
2016-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 150 |
Subjects
Administrative Rules
Navigable Streams
Property
Public Health and Safety
Real Estate
Recreation and Sports
Water Management
Navigable Streams
Property
Public Health and Safety
Real Estate
Recreation and Sports
Water Management