SD HB1084 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the regulation of motorized foot scooters and to declare an emergency.
Title
Provide for the regulation of motorized foot scooters and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Rep. Caleb Finck [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 686 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 536 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 684 |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 2. H.J. 630 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 468 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1084B |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 162 |
2022-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 170 |
2022-01-27 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-01-27 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1084A |
2022-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 39 |