SD HB1085 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Signed by Governor H.J. 552
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Signed by Governor H.J. 552
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the requirement for performance securities.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the requirement for performance securities.
Sponsors
Sen. Herman Otten [R] | Rep. Paula Hawks [D] | Sen. Ried Holien [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] |
Sen. Troy Heinert [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 552 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 529 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 499 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 472 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 453 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 439 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 423 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 397 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 381 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 352 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 250 |
2015-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 231 |
2015-01-28 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 194 |
2015-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 124 |