SD HB1086 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Signed by the Governor on March 05, 2024 H.J. 474
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Signed by the Governor on March 05, 2024 H.J. 474
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish an enhanced penalty for probationers intentionally causing contact with bodily fluids or human waste with a Unified Judicial System employee.
Title
Establish an enhanced penalty for probationers intentionally causing contact with bodily fluids or human waste with a Unified Judicial System employee.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 05, 2024 H.J. 474 |
2024-02-27 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2024 H.J. 410 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 418 |
2024-02-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 393 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 389 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 376 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 148 |
2024-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 148 |
2024-01-19 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 59 |