SD HB1092 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Signed by Governor H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Signed by Governor H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the time frame for conducting hearings to vacate municipal streets or alleys.
Title
Revise the time frame for conducting hearings to vacate municipal streets or alleys.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Rep. Paul Dennert [D] | Rep. Elaine Elliott [D] | Sen. Ried Holien [R] |
Sen. Jim Hundstad [D] | Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Rep. Dean Schrempp [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Signed by Governor H.J. 650 | |
2011-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 584 | |
2011-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 562 | |
2011-02-25 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 537 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 524 | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-23 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 495 | |
2011-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 296 | |
2011-02-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 250 | |
2011-01-31 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 239 | |
2011-01-27 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 192 | |
2011-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 141 |