SD HB1104 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow local governing bodies to require the payment for certain goods and services by electronic transaction.
Title
Allow local governing bodies to require the payment for certain goods and services by electronic transaction.
Sponsors
Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 742 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 671 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 563 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 638 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 524 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 501 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 491 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 445 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 259 |
2014-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 319 |
2014-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 301 |
2014-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 285 |
2014-01-31 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 242 |
2014-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 105 |