SD HB1105 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Give the court discretion to grant a continuance of a protection order in certain situations.
Title
Give the court discretion to grant a continuance of a protection order in certain situations.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Rep. Steven Haugaard [R] | Rep. Fred Romkema [R] |
Rep. Tim Rounds [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 23, 2016 H.J. 650 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 398 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 455 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 325 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 303 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 261 |
2016-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 0. H.J. 322 |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-05 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 301 |
2016-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 181 |