SD HB1105 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the validation of absentee ballot signatures.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the validation of absentee ballot signatures.
Sponsors
Rep. David Lust [R] | Sen. Michael Diedrich [R] | Sen. David Johnson [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2018 H.J. 403 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 422 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 370 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 342 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 271 |
2018-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 208 |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-24 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 164 |
2018-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 113 |