SD HB1110 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide medical care for certain unborn children.
Title
Provide medical care for certain unborn children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 11. S.J. 553 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 531 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 501 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 322 |
2016-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 14. H.J. 399 |
2016-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 383 |
2016-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 370 |
2016-02-09 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 333 |
2016-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 182 |