SD HB1117 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the taking of muskrats by shooting under certain conditions.
Title
Provide for the taking of muskrats by shooting under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 727 | |
2012-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 661 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by President S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 11. S.J. 538 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 500 | |
2012-02-21 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. S.J. 480 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 298 | |
2012-02-06 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 7. H.J. 319 | |
2012-02-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 292 | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 143 |