SD HB1121 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend rate stability provisions to include plant additions.
Title
Amend rate stability provisions to include plant additions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 720 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 639 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 563 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 588 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 508 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 463 | |
2012-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 278 | |
2012-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 304 | |
2012-02-01 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 271 | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 144 |