SD HB1128 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 518
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 518
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allow certain students to participate in the opportunity scholarship program under certain circumstances.
Title
Allow certain students to participate in the opportunity scholarship program under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Lance Russell [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] | Rep. Patty Miller [R] |
Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Sen. Tim Begalka [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 518 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 4. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 435 |
2013-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 32. H.J. 404 |
2013-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 404 Amendment 1128cc |
2013-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 31. H.J. 403 |
2013-02-13 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 372 |
2013-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 35. H.J. 371 |
2013-02-04 | House | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 286 |
2013-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 286 Amendment 1128cb |
2013-01-30 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 3. H.J. 247 |
2013-01-30 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1128jb |
2013-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 131 |