SD HB1129 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 526
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 526
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the property exempt from process in bankruptcy cases.
Title
Revise the property exempt from process in bankruptcy cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 526 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 356 |
2015-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 27. H.J. 346 |
2015-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 333 |
2015-02-04 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 281 |
2015-02-04 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1129rb |
2015-02-04 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1129ra |
2015-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 198 |
2015-01-27 | House | First read in House H.J. 182 |