SD HB1130 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-5)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-5)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Define certain terms relating to bail bonds.
Title
Define certain terms relating to bail bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Judiciary Hoghoused (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Removed from table (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Judiciary Hoghoused (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Removed from table (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 843 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 838 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 837 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 753 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 1. S.J. 731 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 721 Amendment ccL1130A |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 8. H.J. 805 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 795 Amendment CcL1130A |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 794 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 770 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 765 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 701 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 676 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 620 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1130rb |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Judiciary Hoghoused, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. Amendment 1130rc |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Judiciary Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 443 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 278 |
2013-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 12. H.J. 242 |
2013-01-28 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 204 |
2013-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 132 |