SD HB1132 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the titling of motor vehicles, boats, mobile homes, and manufactured homes and the issuance of temporary permits by licensed dealers.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the titling of motor vehicles, boats, mobile homes, and manufactured homes and the issuance of temporary permits by licensed dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 508 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 471 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 456 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 444 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 415 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 390 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 318 |
2015-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 307 |
2015-02-04 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 282 |
2015-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 199 |
2015-01-27 | House | First read in House H.J. 183 |