SD HB1133 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Signed by Governor H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Signed by Governor H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the excusal of a child from school.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the excusal of a child from school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Signed by Governor H.J. 650 | |
2011-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 584 | |
2011-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 562 | |
2011-02-25 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 537 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 527 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 514 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 491 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 470 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 451 | |
2011-02-15 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 426 | |
2011-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-08 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 357 | |
2011-02-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 302 | |
2011-02-02 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 1133cta | |
2011-02-02 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. H.J. 258 | |
2011-02-02 | Education Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1133rb | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 149 |