SD HB1143 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 27, NAYS 43. H.J. 318
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 27, NAYS 43. H.J. 318
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to a perpetrator's knowledge of a rape victim's age or capability to give consent.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to a perpetrator's knowledge of a rape victim's age or capability to give consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 27, NAYS 43. H.J. 318 | |
2012-02-01 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 271 | |
2012-02-01 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1143rb | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-30 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 148 |