SD HB1148 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the minimum wage law for certain seasonal employees and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise the minimum wage law for certain seasonal employees and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 633 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 567 | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 401 | |
2011-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 341 | |
2011-02-07 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1148ota | |
2011-02-07 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 293 | |
2011-02-07 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1148oa | |
2011-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 167 |