SD HB1148 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify registration and residence requirements for voting at a township meeting.
Title
Clarify registration and residence requirements for voting at a township meeting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 545 |
2023-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2023 H.J. 494 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 417 |
2023-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 446 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 360 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 338 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 329 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 13 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 13 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 235 |
2023-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 10. H.J. 264 |
2023-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 264 Amendment 1148A |
2023-02-07 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. |
2023-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 159 |