SD HB1149 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow certain municipal interfund loans.
Title
Allow certain municipal interfund loans.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Dennert [D] | Rep. Elaine Elliott [D] | Sen. Art Fryslie [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] |
Sen. Jim Hundstad [D] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Signed by Governor H.J. 716 | |
2010-03-03 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2010-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 532 | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 644 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 480 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 455 | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 279 | |
2010-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 335 | |
2010-02-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 317 | |
2010-02-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 305 | |
2010-02-02 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 255 | |
2010-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 198 |