SD HB1153 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow parties to agree to resolve an eminent domain dispute by mediation.
Title
Allow parties to agree to resolve an eminent domain dispute by mediation.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Sen. Jim Peterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 H.J. 880 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2016 H.J. 845 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 577 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 807 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 526 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 500 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 429 |
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 650 |
2016-02-19 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-19 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1153ra |
2016-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary, Passed H.J. 381 |
2016-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 214 |