SD HB1162 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 39-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the practice and regulation of midwives.
Title
Provide for the practice and regulation of midwives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 570 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 569 Amendment 1162ma |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 539 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1162rd |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1162re |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 429 |
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 13. H.J. 643 |
2016-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622 |
2016-02-18 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 431 |
2016-02-18 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1162ra |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-16 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 216 |
Subjects
Administrative Rules
Fees
Licenses
Prison and Jail Impact
Professions and Occupations
Public Health and Safety
Fees
Licenses
Prison and Jail Impact
Professions and Occupations
Public Health and Safety