SD HB1163 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reinstate certain civil actions for childhood sexual abuse.
Title
Reinstate certain civil actions for childhood sexual abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 428 |
2015-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-09 | House | Judiciary Deferred to another day, Passed |
2015-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 227 |
2015-01-28 | House | First read in House H.J. 218 |