SD HB1164 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 42. H.J. 307
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 42. H.J. 307
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require a school board to hold a bond election at a primary or school general election.
Title
Require a school board to hold a bond election at a primary or school general election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 42. H.J. 307 |
2024-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 299 |
2024-02-06 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. |
2024-02-06 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1164A |
2024-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 176 |