SD HB1166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding the appointment of inactive watershed district boards and the reactivation of watershed districts and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise provisions regarding the appointment of inactive watershed district boards and the reactivation of watershed districts and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 491 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 504 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 418 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1166A |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 338 |
2020-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 368 |
2020-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 352 |
2020-02-20 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 117 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |