SD HB1166 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 505
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 505
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for road improvements leading to the former entrance into the Palisades State Park and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for road improvements leading to the former entrance into the Palisades State Park and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Failed to concur, no committee appointed (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Removed from table (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Tabled (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Failed to concur, no committee appointed (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Removed from table (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Tabled (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 505 |
2022-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 14. H.J. 645 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Failed to concur, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 492 |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 631 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 472 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 471 Amendment 1166F |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1166E |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 380 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 15. H.J. 454 |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Transportation Referred as Amended to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 2. |
2022-02-17 | House | Transportation Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-10 | House | Transportation Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. |
2022-02-10 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5. Amendment 1166A |
2022-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to House Transportation, Passed H.J. 210 |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |