SD HB1170 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 H.J. 763
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 H.J. 763
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding conflicts of interest for authority, board, or commission members.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding conflicts of interest for authority, board, or commission members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 H.J. 763 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 756 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 739 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 722 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 707 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 644 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 596 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1170wb |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 524 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 471 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 471 Amendment 1170xa |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 470 Amendment 1170cb |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-13 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 369 |
2017-02-13 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1170wa |
2017-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 251 |
Subjects
Conflict of Interest
Education Service Agency
Ethics
Legislature and Statutes
Local Government
Public Officers and Employees
Education Service Agency
Ethics
Legislature and Statutes
Local Government
Public Officers and Employees