SD HB1177 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit certain use of handheld electronic wireless communication devices while driving and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Prohibit certain use of handheld electronic wireless communication devices while driving and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Manny Steele [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] |
Rep. Steve Westra [R] | Sen. Dean Wink [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] |
Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Chuck Jones [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] |
Sen. Timothy Rave [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 787 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 684 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 781 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 18. H.J. 768 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 763 Amendment Cc1177B |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 667 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 661 Amendment Cc1177B |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 749 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 748 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 736 Amendment Cc1177 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 648 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 637 Amendment Cc1177 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 611 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 698 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 597 Amendment 1177fta |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 596 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 595 Amendment 1177fc |
2014-03-05 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 549 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1177og |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 367 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate S.J. 330 |
2014-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 17. H.J. 402 |
2014-02-10 | House | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1177jta |
2014-02-10 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 348 |
2014-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-05 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2014-02-05 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1177ja |
2014-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 157 |