SD HB1178 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 34. H.J. 463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 34. H.J. 463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the use of certain wireless communications devices while driving.
Title
Prohibit the use of certain wireless communications devices while driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 33 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Transportation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Transportation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 34. H.J. 463 | |
2010-02-17 | Intent to reconsider H.J. 454 | |
2010-02-17 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 37. H.J. 454 | |
2010-02-17 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 453 Amendment 1178oa | |
2010-02-16 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 394 | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to House Transportation, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 346 | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 222 |