SD HB1183 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 444
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 444
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a pilot program that uses home-based educational technology to prepare certain preschool children for school, and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establish a pilot program that uses home-based educational technology to prepare certain preschool children for school, and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Education Referred as Amended to House Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Education Referred as Amended to House Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 444 |
2013-02-15 | House | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 1183cta |
2013-02-15 | House | Education Referred as Amended to House Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 7. H.J. 420 |
2013-02-15 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1183ca |
2013-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-13 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-13 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1183ca |
2013-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 170 |