SD HB1183 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2017 H.J. 763
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2017 H.J. 763
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide and revise certain provisions regarding mental health procedures in criminal justice, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Provide and revise certain provisions regarding mental health procedures in criminal justice, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2017 H.J. 763 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 686 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 603 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 603 Amendment 1183fc |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 570 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1183bb |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 556 |
2017-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 17. H.J. 520 |
2017-02-22 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 454 |
2017-02-22 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1183fb |
2017-02-22 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1183ba |
2017-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-02 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 273 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Courts and Judiciary
Criminal Procedure
Law Enforcement
Penal Institutions, Probation, and Parole
Public Health and Safety
Public Officers and Employees
Courts and Judiciary
Criminal Procedure
Law Enforcement
Penal Institutions, Probation, and Parole
Public Health and Safety
Public Officers and Employees