SD HB1187 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-5)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-5)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt health care sharing ministries from the provisions of the health insurance code.
Title
Exempt health care sharing ministries from the provisions of the health insurance code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 727 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 605 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 639 | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 2. S.J. 558 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 498 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 367 | |
2012-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 19. H.J. 394 | |
2012-02-07 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 3. H.J. 354 | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 157 |