SD HB1189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a tribal flag display in the rotunda of the capitol building.
Title
Establish a tribal flag display in the rotunda of the capitol building.
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Rep. Jennifer Healy Keintz [D] |
Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 527 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 450 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 420 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 366 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 422 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 422 Amendment 1189B |
2021-02-24 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 2. |
2021-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 179 |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading House H.J. 165 |