SD HB1192 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 831
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 831
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish an ethanol blender pump incentive grant program, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Establish an ethanol blender pump incentive grant program, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor H.J. 831 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 755 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by President S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 531 | |
2010-03-01 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 484 | |
2010-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 460 | |
2010-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 2. H.J. 581 | |
2010-02-18 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1192tta | |
2010-02-18 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 483 | |
2010-02-18 | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1192td | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 225 |