SD HB1203 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify references to the court in a condemnation proceeding.
Title
Clarify references to the court in a condemnation proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 297 |
2024-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 3. H.J. 296 |
2024-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 284 |
2024-02-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. |
2024-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 197 |