SD HB1206 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 23, NAYS 44. H.J. 638
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 23, NAYS 44. H.J. 638
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the use of handguns in the hunting of game birds.
Title
Authorize the use of handguns in the hunting of game birds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 23, NAYS 44. H.J. 638 |
2016-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622 |
2016-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 470 |
2016-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 452 |
2016-02-16 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 393 |
2016-02-16 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1206fa |
2016-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 259 |