SD HB1206 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-25 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-25 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish fees for information provided from the statewide voter registration file.
Title
Establish fees for information provided from the statewide voter registration file.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 276 |
2022-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 326 |
2022-02-10 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed H.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 Amendment 1206A |
2022-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 138 |