SD HB1212 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the expense allowances of legislators.
Title
Increase the expense allowances of legislators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 39 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 843 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 837 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 815 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 29. H.J. 769 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 15. S.J. 670 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 638 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1212ya |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 523 |
2013-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 33. H.J. 457 |
2013-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2013-02-13 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 385 |
2013-02-13 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1212fb |
2013-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 209 |